This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 21:12:40 (UTC).

EUGENIJUS VALIULIS, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 EUGENIJUS VALIULIS filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM, ANN I. JONES and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9696

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

ANN I. JONES

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VALIULIS EUGENIJUS

VALIULIS EUGENIJUS TRUST

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LACK WALTER J.

ARNETT ASHLEY LYNN

WATERS GREGORY PAUL

WHALEN DANIEL CHARLES

WHALEN DANIEL GLENN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/11/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

3/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 03/18/2021

3/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 03/18/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Notice - NOTICE OF ADOPTION/AMENDMENT OF MASTER COMPLAINT (INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS EUGENIJUS VALIULIS, AN INDIVIDUAL; VALIULIS EUGENJUS TRUST)

3/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ADOPTION/AMENDMENT OF MASTER COMPLAINT (INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS EUGENIJUS VALIULIS, AN INDIVIDUAL; VALIULIS EUGENJUS TRUST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-SECOND PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

5/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-SECOND PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

4/23/2021: Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FIRE CASES); STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FI...)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FIRE CASES); STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FI...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/18/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 1:45 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Informal Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Rye Fire Cases); Status Conference (Rye Fi...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOrder Re: Twenty-Second Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Add-on to JCCP Petition; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Order RE Complex determination; Filed by Eugenijus Valiulis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 11:17 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 03/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eugenijus Valiulis (Plaintiff); Valiulis Eugenijus Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eugenijus Valiulis (Plaintiff); Valiulis Eugenijus Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Adoption/Amendment of Master Complaint (Individual Plaintiffs Eugenijus Valiulis, an Individual; Valiulis Eugenjus Trust); Filed by Eugenijus Valiulis (Plaintiff); Valiulis Eugenijus Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHALEN DANIEL C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARNETT ASHLEY LYNN