This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2023 at 00:36:08 (UTC).

EUGENIA ROBINSON VS ALIREZA KHOSROABADI M.D., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2022 EUGENIA ROBINSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ALIREZA KHOSROABADI M D ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1178

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBINSON EUGENIA

Defendants

CUTTING EDGE SURGICAL INSTITUTE INC.

INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE SURGERY

KHOSROABADI INSTITUTE

KHOSROABADI M.D. ALIREZA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/16/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/7/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/7/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/28/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/28/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/28/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - BY PLAINTIFF'S ...)

10/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - BY PLAINTIFF'S ...)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE

11/2/2022: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

11/14/2022: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/15/2022

12/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/15/2022

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 12/15/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/23/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: EUGENIA ROBINSON (Plaintiff); As to: KHOSROABADI INSTITUTE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lodging Notice of Proof of Service; Filed by: EUGENIA ROBINSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil: Filed By: Alfred J. Wiseman (Attorney); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - by plaintiff's ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - by plaintiff's attorney scheduled for 10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T updated: Result Date to 10/31/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: ALIREZA KHOSROABADI M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: EUGENIA ROBINSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EUGENIA ROBINSON (Plaintiff); As to: ALIREZA KHOSROABADI M.D. (Defendant); INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE SURGERY (Defendant); CUTTING EDGE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Shirley K. Watkins in Department T Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: EUGENIA ROBINSON (Plaintiff); As to: ALIREZA KHOSROABADI M.D. (Defendant); INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE SURGERY (Defendant); CUTTING EDGE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EUGENIA ROBINSON (Plaintiff); As to: ALIREZA KHOSROABADI M.D. (Defendant); INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE SURGERY (Defendant); CUTTING EDGE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1178 Hearing Date: October 31, 2022 Dept: T

IROBINSON V. KHOSROABADIMOTION TO BE RELIEVED*******1178MOTION GRANTED CONTINGENT ON INCLUSION OF PLAINTIFF'S EMAIL IN THE ORDEREFFECTIVE ONLY WHEN PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE CONFORMED ORDER IS FILED