This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 04:21:08 (UTC).

EUGENIA MARTINEZ VS CITIBANK NA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 EUGENIA MARTINEZ filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CITIBANK NA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1346

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ EUGENIA

Defendants

CENLAR FSB

CITIBANK NA

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OKAYO MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/4/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eugenia Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eugenia Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eugenia Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant