This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2022 at 14:47:37 (UTC).

EUGENE PESIKOV, ET AL. VS TORRANCE POLICE DEPARTMENT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 EUGENE PESIKOV filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TORRANCE POLICE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9719

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PESIKOV EUGENE

WHITE JEREMY

Defendants

ALLEN-YOUNG CHRISTOPHER

ALONSO OMAR

CITY OF TORRANCE

CROFTON KEITH

KAWAMOTO BRIAN

KISSINGER ANDREW

LOPEZ RICKY

SENA JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICKETTS MORGAN

Defendant Attorneys

THOMPSON-BELL DELLA D.

MCEWEN JASON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Amended Complaint

8/17/2021: Amended Complaint

Answer

10/20/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/27/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/17/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL

8/17/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FIL...)

8/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FIL...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/17/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL

8/17/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FIL...) OF 08/17/2021

8/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FIL...) OF 08/17/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

10/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Case Management Order

9/25/2020: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/14/2020: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER) OF 09/17/2020

9/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER) OF 09/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eugene Pesikov (Plaintiff); Jeremy White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Jury Trial ((5-7 days)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Torrance (Defendant); Christopher Allen-Young (Defendant); Omar Alonso (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Morgan Ricketts (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Docketat 4:45 PM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Torrance Police Department (Defendant); Torrance Police Officer Kawamoto, sued in his individual capacity (Defendant); Torrance Police Officer Kissinger, sued in his individual capacity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation and Order for Leave to Fil...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Eugene Pesikov (Plaintiff); Jeremy White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by Torrance Police Department (Defendant); Torrance Police Officer Kawamoto, sued in his individual capacity (Defendant); Torrance Police Officer Kissinger, sued in his individual capacity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Torrance Police Department (Defendant); Torrance Police Officer Kawamoto, sued in his individual capacity (Defendant); Torrance Police Officer Kissinger, sued in his individual capacity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim; Filed by Eugene Pesikov (Plaintiff); Jeremy White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim; Filed by Eugene Pesikov (Plaintiff); Jeremy White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim; Filed by Eugene Pesikov (Plaintiff); Jeremy White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim; Filed by Eugene Pesikov (Plaintiff); Jeremy White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eugene Pesikov (Plaintiff); Jeremy White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eugene Pesikov (Plaintiff); Jeremy White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eugene Pesikov (Plaintiff); Jeremy White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eugene Pesikov (Plaintiff); Jeremy White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON-BELL DELLA D.