This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/29/2020 at 16:17:27 (UTC).

EUGENE KIM VS ZALEMARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 EUGENE KIM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZALEMARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7928

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM EUGENE

Defendant

ZALEMARK HOLDING COMPANY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAN FRANKY

THOMPSON ROBERT WALTER

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER

9/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ZALEMARK HOLD...)

9/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ZALEMARK HOLD...)

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

9/4/2019: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CF 5/2/19- PLN'TS ATTY TO GIVE NTC))

9/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CF 5/2/19- PLN'TS ATTY TO GIVE NTC))

Notice of Ruling

9/4/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

5/31/2019: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

4/17/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/14/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

9/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Case Management Statement

7/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

7/5/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - NOTICE OF AMENDED MOTION AND AMENDED MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

6/4/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - NOTICE OF AMENDED MOTION AND AMENDED MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/4/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; CASE MANAGEMENT ...)

5/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; CASE MANAGEMENT ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

4/17/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/11/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal and for This Court to Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 664.6; and Order; Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docketat 5:19 PM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Order Continuing Default Prove-Up Hearing Set...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketOrder (continuing default prove-up hearing); Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( OF JIWON M. SHIN REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF THE DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 8, 2019 AT 8:30 A.M.); Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling ( RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ZALEMARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC. AND ENTER ITS DEFAULT); Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Case Management Conference); Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Initial Status Conference (and proof of service as to all parties) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference and proof of service as to all parties)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Zalemark Holding Company, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.