This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2022 at 11:34:36 (UTC).

ETTA HINDRA VS MR K BEALL

Case Summary

On 01/06/2017 ETTA HINDRA filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against MR K BEALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5977

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HINDRA ETTA

Defendant

BEALL K. MR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS) OF 12/17/2019

12/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS) OF 12/17/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGEMENT VOID 5/10/2018

12/17/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGEMENT VOID 5/10/2018

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION TO AUGMENT RECORD ON APPEAL

12/17/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION TO AUGMENT RECORD ON APPEAL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATIONS

1/22/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATIONS

Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B290000

5/8/2020: Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B290000

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF?S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF?S THIRD [SIC] AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?425.16

4/24/2018: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF?S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF?S THIRD [SIC] AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?425.16

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

9/21/2018: APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B290000); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Augment Record (Motion to Augment due to Newly Found Fraud Evidence and Newly Current Evidence)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion - Other (Ex-Parte Motion to Augment Record)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOpposition (To Ex Parte Applications); Filed by K., Beall, MR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ex-Parte Proceedings) of 12/17/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Motion to Set Aside Judgement Void 5/10/2018); Filed by Etta Hindra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Motion to Augment Record on Appeal); Filed by Etta Hindra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketRequest; Filed by Etta Hindra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketREQUEST ORDER EXTENSION TIME FOR FILING DUE TO EYE SURGERY; REQUEST LEAVE TO AMEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND/EXTEND TIME FOR FILING AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE FOR SURGERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Etta Hindra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT: 1. UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICE, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Etta Hindra

P.O. Box 641083

Los Angeles, CA 90064 Phone: (310) 497-7756 Email: ehindra@yahoo.com Plaintiff in Pro Per

FILED

Superlor Court of California County of Los Angeles

NEC 04 2017

Sherri R. Carter, Executixe Officer/Clerk | By_,zz_m, Deputy

Moses Soto

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Etta Hindra Individual/Plaintiff, V.

Mr. Stuart B. Wolfe, Esq.

(SBN 156471)

Mr. K.A. Beall, Esq.

(SBN 162456)

Mr. Jeffrey S. Kaufman, Esq.

(SBN 156690)

2301 Dupont Dr., #300

Irvine, CA 92612-7531

P: (949) 475-9200; F: (949) 475-9203

E: kabeall@wolfewyman.com sbwolfe@wolfewyman.com

Defendants,

Case No.: BC 645977

2nd Amended COMPLAINTS:

PERSONAL PROPERTY DAMAGE ACCESS TO THE HOUSE & STAY INSIDE THE HOUSE PNC BANK STATED AS THE OWNER/BENEFICIARY TO THE PLAINTIFF’S HOUSE THIS WAS/IS INCORRECT

Hearing Date: 12/4/2017

Time: 9a.m.

Dept.: 74; 7™ Floor, Room 735

Hearing Judge: The Honorable Judge Michele Williams Court

Complaints