This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2021 at 19:05:12 (UTC).

ETHER FUNG VS DEBRA DENISE SCHIAVA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 ETHER FUNG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEBRA DENISE SCHIAVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4516

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUNG ETHER

Defendants

SCHIAVA DEBRA DENISE

SCHIAVA BENJAMIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAN QUANG VAN

Defendant Attorney

SCOFIELD ELYSE K.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/29/2021: Answer

PI General Order

2/26/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/4/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ETHER FUNG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DEBRA DENISE SCHIAVA (Defendant); Benjamin Schiava (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DEBRA DENISE SCHIAVA (Defendant); Benjamin Schiava (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ETHER FUNG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ETHER FUNG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ETHER FUNG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ETHER FUNG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN QUANG VAN