Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 12:38:59 (UTC).

ETHELYN BELTRAN VS BENJAMIN VILLA CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 ETHELYN BELTRAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BENJAMIN VILLA CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9404

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELTRAN ETHELYN

Defendant

CHAVEZ BENJAMIN VILLA AKA BENJAMIN VILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELDABE S. EDMOND

Defendant Attorneys

FITZHUGH TIMOTHY

MACDONALD SCOTT L.

LEOS RORY D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/29/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

1/12/2021: Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

Association of Attorney

10/27/2020: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

10/29/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Demand for Jury Trial

7/6/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/6/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ethelyn Beltran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Ethelyn Beltran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOffer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998; Filed by Ethelyn Beltran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Benjamin Villa Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Benjamin Villa Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Benjamin Villa Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Benjamin Villa Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Benjamin Villa Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ethelyn Beltran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ethelyn Beltran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ethelyn Beltran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ethelyn Beltran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EL DABE S. EDMOND ESQ.