This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2022 at 03:33:33 (UTC).

ETHAN DITTMAN, ET AL. VS LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 ETHAN DITTMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN C. YEP and STEPHEN MORGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0126

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN C. YEP

STEPHEN MORGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DITTMAN FAUZIAH

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT

TORRES BRANDON

SANTANA RAMON

TORRES DORIS

Not Classified By Court

DITTMAN PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALGORRI MARK STEVEN

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PHILLIPS THOMAS MILES

LERMAN JEFFREY EDWARD

PHILLIPS THOMAS

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

QUILLER DOMINIC A

 

Court Documents

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

5/9/2022: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/11/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

2/10/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; ORDER TO S...)

2/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; ORDER TO S...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK S. NOLAN REGARDING RELEASE OF MINOR'S FUNDS TO CONTROL OF PARENT/GUARDIAN AD LITEM PAUL DITTMAN

2/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK S. NOLAN REGARDING RELEASE OF MINOR'S FUNDS TO CONTROL OF PARENT/GUARDIAN AD LITEM PAUL DITTMAN

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

2/25/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order to Deposit - ORDER TO DEPOSIT ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS IN ACCOUNT

2/25/2022: Order to Deposit - ORDER TO DEPOSIT ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS IN ACCOUNT

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

1/14/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/19/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

11/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK S. NOLAN IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

11/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK S. NOLAN IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

11/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SA...)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SA...)

Notice of Settlement

6/3/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

2/26/2021: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

2/26/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • Hearing06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Hearing06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Ethan Dittman (Plaintiff); Fauziah Dittman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Deposit (Order to Deposit Funds in Account); Filed by Ethan Dittman (Plaintiff); Fauziah Dittman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Ethan Dittman (Plaintiff); Fauziah Dittman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Lancaster School District (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lancaster School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lancaster School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ethan Dittman (Plaintiff); Fauziah Dittman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Ethan Dittman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ethan Dittman (Plaintiff); Fauziah Dittman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ethan Dittman (Plaintiff); Fauziah Dittman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0126    Hearing Date: March 25, 2021    Dept: A14

CASE NAME:

HEARING DATE: March 25, 2021

SUBJECT: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

The Motion is GRANTED as unopposed.  

The Court finds that the settlement between Plaintiffs Ethan Dittman, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Paul Dittman, and Fauziah Dittman (collectively "Plaintiffs") and Settling Defendants Doris Torres and Brandon Torres is in good faith; and  


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANCASTER SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUILLER DOMINIC A