This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 20:48:12 (UTC).

ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1909

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANDINOVA AN INDIVIDUAL ESYA

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

9090 WILSHIRE L.P. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRADKIN ESQ IGOR

Defendant Attorneys

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL RALPH

PELCH MANAL H.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DUMITRESCU SILVIANA D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Cross-Complaint

10/7/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

10/7/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/9/2022: Answer

Answer

6/23/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

7/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/7/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/7/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2025
  • Hearing04/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2023
  • Hearing10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • Hearing09/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) to COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL on 04/07/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL as to COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); As to: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: 9090 WILSHIRE, L.P., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: 9090 WILSHIRE, L.P., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: Roes 1 to 25 (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: 9090 WILSHIRE, L.P., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 08/23/2022; Service Cost: 113.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL on 04/07/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL as to COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ESYA KANDINOVA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRADKIN IGOR