This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2022 at 11:46:05 (UTC).

ESVIN JUVENTINO CHAICOJ MORALES, ET AL. VS NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 ESVIN JUVENTINO CHAICOJ MORALES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5682

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ SANCHEZ ALEJANDRO

MORALES ESVIN JUVENTINO CHAICOJ

CHAICOJ MORALES ESVIN JUVENTINO

Defendant

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/11/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/31/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/31/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • Hearing10/10/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Esvin Juventino Chaicoj Morales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Hernandez Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Esvin Juventino Chaicoj Morales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Hernandez Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Esvin Juventino Chaicoj Morales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Hernandez Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Esvin Juventino Chaicoj Morales (Plaintiff); Alejandro Hernandez Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA