This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2021 at 18:18:51 (UTC).

ESTRELLA, MAIRA VS CHAWLA, POOJA S.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 ESTRELLA, MAIRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHAWLA, POOJA S. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7477

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESTRELLA MAIRA

Respondent

CHAWLA POOJA S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

OKHOVAT AIDIN

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

7/6/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/6/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - Income and Expense

6/29/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Summons

6/29/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/29/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

6/29/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OKHOVAT AIDIN