This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2021 at 17:49:42 (UTC).

ESTHER VAZQUEZ MUNOZ, ET AL. VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 ESTHER VAZQUEZ MUNOZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7820

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MUNOZ ESTHER VAZQUEZ

OROZCO JADIEL CRUZ

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACOBSON KEVIN

JACOBSON KEVIN Y

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Esther Vazquez Munoz (Plaintiff); Jadiel Cruz Orozco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Esther Vazquez Munoz (Plaintiff); Jadiel Cruz Orozco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Esther Vazquez Munoz (Plaintiff); Jadiel Cruz Orozco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Esther Vazquez Munoz (Plaintiff); Jadiel Cruz Orozco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON KEVIN