This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2022 at 12:37:34 (UTC).

ESTHER FAITH ELIAS VS JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 ESTHER FAITH ELIAS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN, LAWRENCE P. RIFF, UPINDER S. KALRA and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9982

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

UPINDER S. KALRA

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIAS ESTHER FAITH

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION

Cross Defendants

ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC FKA ABM ONSITE-SERVICES-WEST INC. FKA ABM ENGINEERING SERVICES COMPANY

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION

ROES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAURIA CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

OVERTON SARAH LEE

HAYES FREDERICK BREVARD JR

Cross Defendant Attorney

OLSEN CHRISTOPHER TED

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL COMPLAINT ONLY

11/9/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL COMPLAINT ONLY

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA ONLY

11/9/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA ONLY

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 09/14/2022

9/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 09/14/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

9/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

5/4/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/14/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Settlement

6/17/2022: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/17/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

7/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES DECLARATION OF THOMAS M. GAFFNEY; STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES

1/11/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES DECLARATION OF THOMAS M. GAFFNEY; STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES

Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

1/12/2022: Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AN...) OF 01/12/2022

1/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AN...) OF 01/12/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AN...)

1/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL

12/3/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL

12/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Order - ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES PURSUANT TO STIPULAITON

12/13/2021: Order - ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES PURSUANT TO STIPULAITON

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (duplicate dismissal of cross complaint filed by Judicial Council of California); Filed by Judicial Council of California (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Complaint only); Filed by Esther Faith Elias (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Cross-Complaint of Judicial Council of California only); Filed by Judicial Council of California (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Upinder S. Kalra, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 09/14/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Upinder S. Kalra, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketReply/Response; Filed by Judicial Council of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER; DEFENDANT JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Judicial Council of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Esther Faith Elias (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Esther Faith Elias (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9982    Hearing Date: January 16, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

ESTHER FAITH ELIAS,

Plaintiff,

v.

JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****9982

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE DENNIS LANDIN presiding in DEPT. 51 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: January 16, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLSEN CHRISTOPHER TED