This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:47:46 (UTC).

ESTER S CHAO VS JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 ESTER S CHAO filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD FRUIN and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4781

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD FRUIN

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Appellant

CHAO ESTER S.

Defendants and Respondents

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

DOES 1 TO 10

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MONTGOMERY MICHAEL B. ESQ.

ALPERT JEFFREY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WATSON BRETT D.

BELKNAP HANNAH P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/8/2017: Complaint

DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/15/2018: DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

2/15/2018: Answer

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ORDER

6/29/2018: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ORDER

Unknown

11/15/2018: Unknown

Trial Brief

12/3/2018: Trial Brief

Substitution of Attorney

2/21/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

4/2/2019: Minute Order

Statement of Decision

4/2/2019: Statement of Decision

Request

4/16/2019: Request

Unknown

4/25/2019: Unknown

Unknown

5/23/2019: Unknown

Proof of Service by Mail

5/23/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order

1/31/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

12/12/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Minute Order

10/26/2017: Minute Order

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO RECLASSIFY: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/16/2017: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO RECLASSIFY: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

SUMMONS

6/26/2017: SUMMONS

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Ester S. Chao (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Ester S. Chao (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail (Appeal); Filed by Ester S. Chao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by Ester S. Chao (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Ester S. Chao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 1:57 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 04/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Judgment; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Defendant); JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Statement of Decision; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Consolidated Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Complaint and Motion to Reclassify [as Limited Jurisdiction Matter]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [170830247117]; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Declaration (of Hannah P. Belknap in Support of Consolidated Demurrer & Motion to Reclassify [as Limited Jurisdiction Matter] and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint [170830247117]); Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S CONSOLIDATED NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO RECLASSIFY [AS LIMITED JURISDICTION MATTER]; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [170830247117]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DECLARATION OF HANNAH P. BELKNAP IN SUPPORT OF CONSOLIDATED DEMURRER & MOTION TO RECLASSIFY [AS LIMITED JURISDICTION MATTER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Complaint (for Conversion of Funds); Filed by Ester S. Chao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR CONVERSION OF FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

& A - \

Brett D. Watson, SBN: 203183 | E-Mail: bwatson@ldattorneys.com

Hannah P. Belknap, SBN 294155

E-Mail: hfernandez@ldattorneys.com FILED LOMBARDI & DONOHUE LLP Superior Court of California 800 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 800 County of Los Angeles Los Angeles, CA 90017 DEC 1 2 2017

Tel: (213) 688-0430

Fax: (213) 688-0440 Sherri R. Carter, Execuuive Officer/Clerk

By , Deputy

Attorneys for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Moses Soto

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Esther S. Chao, Case No. BC664781

Plaintiff, ' [Assigned for all purposes to the Honorable Richard L. Fruin] Vs. DECLARATION OF HANNAH P. BELKNAP

JP Morgan Chase Bank, National IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER & MOTION Association, and as Successor to TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFE’S Washington Mutual Bank, a National FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Banking Association; Does 1 through 10, DATE: January 31, 2018 Defendants. TIME: 8:30 a.m.

DEPT.: 15

RESERVATION NO.: 171212273561

Complaint Filed June 12, 2017

DECLARATION OF HANNAH P. BELKNAP