This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2022 at 22:16:04 (UTC).

ESTER HURLEY VS SANTA ANITA PROP LP

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 ESTER HURLEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SANTA ANITA PROP LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9237

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HURLEY ESTER

Defendant

SANTA ANITA PROP LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARKER MICHAEL R.

Defendant Attorney

CARRON PAUL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/21/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/2/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

6/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/30/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/30/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/3/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2024
  • Hearing05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • Hearing11/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Santa Anita Prop LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Santa Anita Prop LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Santa Anita Prop LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ester Hurley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ester Hurley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ester Hurley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ester Hurley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER MICHAEL R.