This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2022 at 05:59:25 (UTC).

ESTEPHANIE SANCHEZ VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 ESTEPHANIE SANCHEZ filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0758

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ ESTEPHANIE

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/30/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Demand for Jury Trial

9/30/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Hearing12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: ESTEPHANIE SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/04/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ESTEPHANIE SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: ESTEPHANIE SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ESTEPHANIE SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ESTEPHANIE SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRNOS ROGER