This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 01:33:07 (UTC).

ESTEBAN SALGADO ET AL VS HUGO L MORALES

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 ESTEBAN SALGADO filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HUGO L MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY A. GREEN and TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4448

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY A. GREEN

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SALGADO ESTEBAN

PUGA MARISOL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

MORALES HUGO L. SR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

USUDE JOVI G.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

YOO S. CHRISTOPHER ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice

1/24/2019: Notice

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

3/6/2019: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for

3/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

1/23/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/16/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/14/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

8/7/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/22/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/3/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE RE; CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/12/2018: NOTICE RE; CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE; CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/12/2018: NOTICE RE; CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/7/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/11/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/6/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Minute Order

3/14/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/22/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/16/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Request for Dismissal]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Notice (of Dismissal of case without prejudice); Filed by Hugo L. Sr. Morales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; Status Conference (Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • at 08:46 AM in Department 14; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Esteban Salgado (Plaintiff); Marisol Puga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Esteban Salgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOO S. CHRISTOPHER