This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 02:17:24 (UTC).

ESTEBAN PINEDA VS ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 ESTEBAN PINEDA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4290

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINEDA ESTEBAN

Defendants

ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES INC.

SUNLIFE HERBAL COMPANY INC.

SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING L.P. DBA SUNRIDER INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL JASMIN KAUR

Defendant Attorneys

JENSEN GARRETT VOORHEES

FRICK ROBYN ELISE

HAGOPIAN DAVID GEORGE

COLEMAN CLAUDIA MARISOL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE)

8/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/3/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Related Case

7/18/2023: Notice of Related Case

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

7/3/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ESTEBAN PINEDA'S COMPLAINT

6/30/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ESTEBAN PINEDA'S COMPLAINT

Substitution of Attorney

6/29/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/29/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/29/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Order - ORDER CASE ANYWHERE

6/2/2023: Order - ORDER CASE ANYWHERE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

5/25/2023: Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANTS SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING, L.P. AND SUNLIFE HERBAL COMPANY, INC.

5/24/2023: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANTS SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING, L.P. AND SUNLIFE HERBAL COMPANY, INC.

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

5/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC.

4/6/2023: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC.

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) OF SUMMONS

3/20/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2024
  • Hearing04/11/2024 at 4:30 PM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 11:30 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 09/26/2023 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketMessage Board Posting Case Anywhere Thread - Request for An Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 09/26/2023 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/09/2023 11:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Related Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 23STCV04290, 23TRCV01409 are related; case number 23STCV04290 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Elwood Staffing Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action) of 02/28/2023, Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Esteban Pineda (Plaintiff); As to: Elwood Staffing Services, Inc. (Defendant); SunRider Manufacturing, L.P. (Defendant); Sunlife Herbal Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Esteban Pineda (Plaintiff); As to: Elwood Staffing Services, Inc. (Defendant); SunRider Manufacturing, L.P. (Defendant); Sunlife Herbal Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Esteban Pineda (Plaintiff); As to: Elwood Staffing Services, Inc. (Defendant); SunRider Manufacturing, L.P. (Defendant); Sunlife Herbal Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less