This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2023 at 04:00:04 (UTC).

ESTEBAN PINEDA VS ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 ESTEBAN PINEDA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4290

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINEDA ESTEBAN

Defendants

ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES INC.

SUNLIFE HERBAL COMPANY INC.

SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING L.P. DBA SUNRIDER INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL JASMIN KAUR

Defendant Attorneys

JENSEN GARRETT VOORHEES

FRICK ROBYN ELISE

HAGOPIAN DAVID GEORGE

COLEMAN CLAUDIA MARISOL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference)

11/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference)

Message Board Posting (name extension) Message Board Posting Case Anywhere Thread - Request for an Informal Discovery Conference

10/23/2023: Message Board Posting (name extension) Message Board Posting Case Anywhere Thread - Request for an Informal Discovery Conference

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference)

10/25/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference)

Joint Status Conference Report Joint Status Report of Parties

10/17/2023: Joint Status Conference Report Joint Status Report of Parties

Minute Order Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

10/9/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

Message Board Posting (name extension) Message Board Posting Case Anywhere Thread - Request for An Informal Discovery Conference

9/21/2023: Message Board Posting (name extension) Message Board Posting Case Anywhere Thread - Request for An Informal Discovery Conference

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order re: Related Case)

8/3/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order re: Related Case)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/3/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Related Case

7/18/2023: Notice of Related Case

Answer Defendant Elwood Staffing Services, INC.'s Answer To Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint

7/3/2023: Answer Defendant Elwood Staffing Services, INC.'s Answer To Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint

Answer Defendants Sunrider Manufacturing, L.P. and Sunlife Herbal Company, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff Esteban Pineda's Complaint

6/30/2023: Answer Defendants Sunrider Manufacturing, L.P. and Sunlife Herbal Company, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff Esteban Pineda's Complaint

Substitution of Attorney

6/29/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/29/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/29/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Order (name extension) Order Case Anywhere

6/2/2023: Order (name extension) Order Case Anywhere

Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

6/2/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

Initial Status Conference Report Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement

5/25/2023: Initial Status Conference Report Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement

Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance Notice Of Appearance Of Defendants Sunrider Manufacturing, L.P. And Sunlife Herbal Company, Inc.

5/24/2023: Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance Notice Of Appearance Of Defendants Sunrider Manufacturing, L.P. And Sunlife Herbal Company, Inc.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/11/2024

Hearing04/11/2024 at 4:30 PM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 updated: Result Date to 11/14/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Status Conference scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 11/14/2023 11:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketMessage Board Posting Case Anywhere Thread - Request for an Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Status Conference scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/25/2023 09:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketJoint Status Report of Parties; Filed by: Esteban Pineda (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketMinute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 11:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 updated: Result Date to 10/09/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
02/28/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action) of 02/28/2023, Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Esteban Pineda (Plaintiff); As to: Elwood Staffing Services, Inc. (Defendant); SunRider Manufacturing, L.P. (Defendant); Sunlife Herbal Company, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Esteban Pineda (Plaintiff); As to: Elwood Staffing Services, Inc. (Defendant); SunRider Manufacturing, L.P. (Defendant); Sunlife Herbal Company, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Esteban Pineda (Plaintiff); As to: Elwood Staffing Services, Inc. (Defendant); SunRider Manufacturing, L.P. (Defendant); Sunlife Herbal Company, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less