This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 19:46:29 (UTC).

ESTEBAN JIMENEZ VS OUR LADY OF LOURDES SCHOOL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 ESTEBAN JIMENEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OUR LADY OF LOURDES SCHOOL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4309

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMENEZ ESTEBAN

Defendants

OUR LADY OF LOURDES SCHOOL

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES A CORPORATION SOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TABONE DEREK L.

Defendant Attorney

BIR DANIEL W.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/15/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

3/18/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/18/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

10/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ESTEBAN JIMENEZ on 12/03/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ESTEBAN JIMENEZ as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ESTEBAN JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OUR LADY OF LOURDES SCHOOL (Defendant); THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION SOLE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: OUR LADY OF LOURDES SCHOOL (Defendant); THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION SOLE (Defendant); As to: ESTEBAN JIMENEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: OUR LADY OF LOURDES SCHOOL (Defendant); THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION SOLE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ESTEBAN JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OUR LADY OF LOURDES SCHOOL (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/29/2022; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ESTEBAN JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION SOLE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/29/2022; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ESTEBAN JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION SOLE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/29/2022; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ESTEBAN JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OUR LADY OF LOURDES SCHOOL (Defendant); THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION SOLE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ESTEBAN JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OUR LADY OF LOURDES SCHOOL (Defendant); THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION SOLE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ESTEBAN JIMENEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OUR LADY OF LOURDES SCHOOL (Defendant); THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION SOLE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less