This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 08:31:28 (UTC).

ESTATE OF WYNDHAM WAYNE CHOW BY AND THROUGH ITS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, JOSIE TANG, ET AL. VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (CALTRANS), ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 ESTATE OF WYNDHAM WAYNE CHOW BY AND THROUGH ITS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, JOSIE TANG, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION CALTRANS ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7428

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARIKAWA ANZU OLINA

ARIKAWA KOU KEOLA

ESTATE OF WYNDHAM WAYNE CHOW BY AND THROUGH ITS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JOSIE TANG

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION CALTRANS

CITY OF LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE

CLARO DEBRA ARIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIREN MATTHEW B.F.

Defendant Attorney

FERRANTE-ALAN DAVID M.

Cross Defendant Attorney

LICERIO MARISELA

 

Court Documents

Answer

12/13/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

12/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

12/1/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

12/1/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/15/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/14/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/14/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

11/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ANZU

8/26/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ANZU

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

8/23/2022: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/23/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2024
  • Hearing08/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2024
  • Hearing02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2024
  • Hearing02/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation Erroneously Sued As California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS) (Cross-Defendant); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS) (Cross-Complainant); As to: Debra Ariana Claro (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS) (Defendant); As to: Estate of Wyndham Wayne Chow by and through its Personal Representative, Josie Tang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS) (Defendant); As to: Debra Ariana Claro (Defendant on defendant's claim)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); As to: Debra Ariana Claro (Defendant on defendant's claim); California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSummons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); As to: California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); As to: Estate of Wyndham Wayne Chow by and through its Personal Representative, Josie Tang (Plaintiff); Kou Keola Arikawa (Plaintiff); Anzu Olina Arikawa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Kou: Filed By: Anzu Olina Arikawa (Plaintiff),Kou Keola Arikawa (Plaintiff),Estate of Wyndham Wayne Chow by and through its Personal Representative, Josie Tang (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Estate of Wyndham Wayne Chow by and through its Personal Representative, Josie Tang (Plaintiff); Kou Keola Arikawa (Plaintiff); Anzu Olina Arikawa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Estate of Wyndham Wayne Chow by and through its Personal Representative, Josie Tang (Plaintiff); Kou Keola Arikawa (Plaintiff); Anzu Olina Arikawa (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS) (Defendant); City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Ferrante-Alan