This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2023 at 03:38:50 (UTC).

ESTATE OF MICHAEL STEPHEN SEXTON, ET AL. VS KENMORE APPLIANCES, AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 ESTATE OF MICHAEL STEPHEN SEXTON, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KENMORE APPLIANCES, AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0281

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELTZ RACHAEL MARIE

BELTZ RYAN STEPHEN

ESTATE OF MICHAEL STEPHEN SEXTON

Defendants

CONOVER AND INDIVIDUAL RON

ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

FRIGIDAIRE AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

KENMORE APPLIANCES AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

WHITE CONSOLIDATED INDUSTRIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARPENTER ESQ. JOHN C

Defendant Attorneys

WALLS NICHOLAS S

ZEILER TREVOR C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - Dismissal

9/13/2023: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

9/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 09/13/2023

9/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 09/13/2023

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/13/2023

9/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/13/2023

Case Management Statement

9/12/2023: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RACHAEL MARIE MEYER AS SUCCESSOR IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32

9/12/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RACHAEL MARIE MEYER AS SUCCESSOR IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32

Case Management Statement

8/29/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/29/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS ON "FRIGIDAIRE" AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/8/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS ON "FRIGIDAIRE" AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

6/7/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS...)

6/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS...)

Order - Dismissal

6/7/2023: Order - Dismissal

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. AND SPECIALLY APPEARING NONEXISTENT ENTITY FRIGIDAIRES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS ON FRIGIDAIRE

5/31/2023: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. AND SPECIALLY APPEARING NONEXISTENT ENTITY FRIGIDAIRES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS ON FRIGIDAIRE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MONEE TAKLA HANNA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. AND SPECIALLY APPEARING NONEXISTENT ENTITY FRIGIDAIRES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO Q

5/31/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MONEE TAKLA HANNA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. AND SPECIALLY APPEARING NONEXISTENT ENTITY FRIGIDAIRES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO Q

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE

5/25/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/22/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Estate of Michael Stephen Sexton, et al. on 01/23/2023, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Kenmore Appliances, an entity of unknown form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 09/13/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W updated: Result Date to 09/13/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 09/13/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF RACHAEL MARIE MEYER AS SUCCESSOR IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32; Filed by: Estate of Michael Stephen Sexton (Plaintiff); Rachael Marie Beltz (Plaintiff); Ryan Stephen Beltz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Estate of Michael Stephen Sexton (Plaintiff); As to: Kenmore Appliances, an entity of unknown form (Defendant); Service Date: 03/17/2023; Service Cost: 344.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Estate of Michael Stephen Sexton (Plaintiff); As to: Kenmore Appliances, an entity of unknown form (Defendant); Service Date: 03/17/2023; Service Cost: 337.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Estate of Michael Stephen Sexton (Plaintiff); As to: White Consolidated Industries, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 03/17/2023; Service Cost: 337.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Estate of Michael Stephen Sexton (Plaintiff); Rachael Marie Beltz (Plaintiff); Ryan Stephen Beltz (Plaintiff); As to: Kenmore Appliances, an entity of unknown form (Defendant); Frigidaire, an entity of unknown form (Defendant); Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Estate of Michael Stephen Sexton (Plaintiff); Rachael Marie Beltz (Plaintiff); Ryan Stephen Beltz (Plaintiff); As to: Kenmore Appliances, an entity of unknown form (Defendant); Frigidaire, an entity of unknown form (Defendant); Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Estate of Michael Stephen Sexton (Plaintiff); Rachael Marie Beltz (Plaintiff); Ryan Stephen Beltz (Plaintiff); As to: Kenmore Appliances, an entity of unknown form (Defendant); Frigidaire, an entity of unknown form (Defendant); Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0281 Hearing Date: June 7, 2023 Dept: W

ESTATE OF MICHAEL STEPHEN SEXTON, ET AL. V. KENMORE APPLIANCES, AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM, ET AL.

DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. AND SPECIALLY APPEARING NONEXISTENT ENTITY “FRIGIDAIRE’S” MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS ON “FRIGIDAIRE”

Date of Hearing: June 7, 2023 Trial Date: None set.

Department: W Case No.: *******0281

Moving Party: Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Specially Appearing Nonexistent Entity “Frigidaire”

Responding Party: Plaintiffs Estate of Michael Stephen Sexton, Rachael Marie Beltz, and Ryan Stephen Beltz

BACKGROUND

This is a wrongful death action arising out of the death of Michael Stephen Sexton. Plaintiffs Estate of Michael Stephen Sexton, Rachael Marie Beltz, and Ryan Stephen Beltz allege Defendant Ron Conover purchased a Kenmore Elite Gas Range, Model Number VF33544960, to be installed in his home. The home was subsequently rented to the decedent, Michael Stephen Sexton. On February 5, 2021, decedent Michael Stephen Sexton attempted to ignite the Kenmore Elite Gas Range when a gas leak caused by the defective component parts caused an explosion, taking Mr. Sexton’s life.

On January 23, 2023, Plaintiffs filed a complaint against Defendants Kenmore Appliances, Frigidaire, Electrolux Home Products, White Consolidated Industries, Inc., Ron Conover asserting causes of action for wrongful death – negligence, wrongful death – products liability, wrongful death – premises liability, and survival action.

[TENTATIVE] RULING

Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. And Specially Appearing Nonexistent Entity “Frigidaire’s” Motion to Quash Service Of Process On “Frigidaire” is GRANTED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Specially Appearing Nonexistent Entity “Frigidaire” request this court take judicial notice of the following documents:

(1) screenshot of California Secretary of State business search page using the search term “Frigidaire,” which shows there is no known existing registered corporate entity known as Frigidaire (Exh. 1); (2) screenshot of North Carolina Secretary of State business search page using the search term “Frigidaire,” which shows there is no known existing registered corporate entity known as Frigidaire (Exh. 2); (3) proof of Service of Summons and Complaint by Plaintiffs on Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Exh. 3); and (4) alleged Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint by Plaintiffs on nonexistent entity “Frigidaire, an entity of unknown form” (Exh. 4).

The court grants the request for judicial notice.

DISCUSSION

Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Specially Appearing Nonexistent Entity “Frigidaire” move this court for an order pursuant to Section 418.10 of the California Code of Civil Procedure quashing service of summons in this action on “Frigidaire” on the grounds that 1) “Frigidaire” does not exist as a distinct legal entity; 2) this Court lacks personal jurisdiction over “Frigidaire”; and 3) “service” was improperly effectuated.

“A defendant . . . may serve and file a notice of motion for one or more of the following purposes: (1) To quash service of summons on the ground of lack of jurisdiction of the court over him or her . . . .” (CCP 418.10(a).) When a defendant moves to quash service of the summons and complaint, the plaintiff has “the burden of proving the facts that did give the court jurisdiction, that is the facts requisite to an effective service.” (Coulston v. Cooper (1966) 245 Cal.App.2d 866, 868.) “A court lacks jurisdiction over a party if there has not been proper service of process.” (Ruttenberg v. Ruttenberg (1997) 53 Cal.App.4th 801, 808.)

“Frigidaire” argues “Frigidaire” is a brand name, not a legal entity. (Graham Decl. 5-6.) “Frigidaire” contends the brand name’s owner and properly named defendant, Electrolux, has already been sued and served. (Graham Decl. 7.) As a result, the instant civil action cannot be maintained in California against a nonexistent entity.

Plaintiff opposes the motion to the extent “Frigidaire” seeks an order from the court dismissing “Frigidaire” entirely. Plaintiffs argue there should be no question as to whether Electrolux is doing business under the fictitious business name “Frigidaire,” yet no filing with the California Secretary of State or other authority has been made establishing this use. Plaintiffs also contend the parties had reached an agreement to allow counsel for Defendant Electrolux to file an Answer to Plaintiff’s Complaint on

behalf of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Individually and Doing Business as Frigidaire.

Although California statute prohibits a person or entity from conducting business under a fictitious business name unless they have followed all the registration procedures, this does not determine whether a FBN or DBA may be sued separately in California. “’The business name is a fiction, and so too is any implication that the business is a legal entity separate from its owner.’” (Pinkerton's, Inc. v. Superior Court (1996) 49 Cal.App.4th 1342, 1348.) “’[W]here a person or corporation elects to follow the statutory procedure of section 17900 et seq. of the Business and Professions Code, it has held itself out to those with whom it does business as having adopted that name for all business purposes. Notice to it under that name is all that the law requires.’) But while a corporation may be sued by its fictitious business name, once its true name is discovered, all further proceedings should be in the corporate name. (Code Civ. Proc., 474; see Ballantine & Sterling, Cal. Corporation Law (4th ed. 1996) 49.04, pp. 3–50.8 to 3–52.)” (Id. at p. 1349.)

Because Frigidaire does not exist as a legal entity, Plaintiffs cannot proceed against it. Accordingly, Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. And Specially Appearing Nonexistent Entity “Frigidaire’s” Motion to Quash Service Of Process On “Frigidaire” is GRANTED.