This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/31/2020 at 00:23:25 (UTC).

ESTATE OF CARMEL MUSGROVE ET AL VS MARTIN HERROLD ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 ESTATE OF CARMEL MUSGROVE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARTIN HERROLD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3010

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MUSGROVE RONALD

MUSGROVE ANN

ESTATE OF CARMEL MUSGROVE

Defendants and Respondents

HERROLD MARTIN

SILVER PICTURES

SILVER JOEL

SILVER-KATZ HOLDINGS

DOES 1 TO 10

SILVER PICTURES ENTERTAINEMENT

SILVER-KATZ HOLDINGS LLC

CASA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WATKINS BRIAN E.

WALLACE BRADLEY S. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

MOSS MICHAEL STEVEN

FOX DANA ALDEN

SAALFELD BRYAN L.

ZYGELMAN CORINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) DEFENDANT JOEL SILVER'S NOTICE OF JOINDER TO SILVER PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT AND SILVER-KATZ HOLDINGS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TOE TRIAL AN

8/5/2019: Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) DEFENDANT JOEL SILVER'S NOTICE OF JOINDER TO SILVER PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT AND SILVER-KATZ HOLDINGS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TOE TRIAL AN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATE AND TRIAL DATE

11/18/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATE AND TRIAL DATE

Commission to Take Deposition Outside California

12/9/2019: Commission to Take Deposition Outside California

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE AND PROPOSED ORDERFORJUDGETOGRANT PERMISSION TO DOMES TICA TE DEPOSITION SUBPEONA OF IGOR MOROSOWSKJ

12/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE AND PROPOSED ORDERFORJUDGETOGRANT PERMISSION TO DOMES TICA TE DEPOSITION SUBPEONA OF IGOR MOROSOWSKJ

Notice - NOTICE SEPARATELY BOUND VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOEL SILVER'S AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS

12/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE SEPARATELY BOUND VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOEL SILVER'S AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS

Notice - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTS

1/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

6/22/2020: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SILVERS MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPEONAS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JOEL SILVER AND HIS COUNSEL, MATTHEW VOSS, JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY, IN THE AMO

7/17/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SILVERS MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPEONAS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JOEL SILVER AND HIS COUNSEL, MATTHEW VOSS, JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY, IN THE AMO

THE MUSGROVES' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

1/25/2018: THE MUSGROVES' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

1/29/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

4/16/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

Notice - Notice of ruling Re: informal discovery conference

10/25/2018: Notice - Notice of ruling Re: informal discovery conference

Notice of Ruling

12/20/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice - Notice of Taking February 14, 2019 Motion to Compel Hearing Off-Calendar

1/30/2019: Notice - Notice of Taking February 14, 2019 Motion to Compel Hearing Off-Calendar

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT

5/31/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT

AMENDED SUCCESSOR AFFIDAVIT OF RONALD AND ANN MUSGROVE

11/30/2017: AMENDED SUCCESSOR AFFIDAVIT OF RONALD AND ANN MUSGROVE

159 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • Hearing06/07/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Hearing05/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Hearing02/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer (DEFENDANT MARTIN HEROLD?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Martin Herrold (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Re Leave to File an Answer Beyond 30 days); Filed by Martin Herrold (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JOEL Sil VER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOEL SILVER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS RE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Joel Silver (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Joel Silver (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketBrief (SEPARATELY BOUND VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOEL SILVER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS RE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Joel Silver (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF MATTHEW E. VOSS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOEL SILVER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFFS RE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Joel Silver (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
260 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Joel Silver (Defendant); Silver Pictures (Legacy Party); Silver-Katz Holdings (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketAMENDED SUCCESSOR AFFIDAVIT OF RONALD AND ANN MUSGROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Estate of Carmel Musgrove (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketSUCCESSOR AFFIDAVIT OF RONALD AND ANN MUSGROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Estate of Carmel Musgrove (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Docket1. WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Estate of Carmel Musgrove (Plaintiff); Ronald Musgrove (Plaintiff); Ann Musgrove (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC673010    Hearing Date: June 22, 2020    Dept: 51

Having read and considered the parties responses to the Court’s invitation to comment on whether it should change its order denying Plaintiff’s motion for leave to file an amended complaint, the Court vacates its February 26, 2020, order denying leave to amend and grants the motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. The Court will also continue the current trial date of November 16, 2020, at least six months.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATKINS BRIAN ERIC