This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 01:22:04 (UTC).

ESTATE OF CARLOS GONZALEZ ET AL VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 ESTATE OF CARLOS GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG, THOMAS D. LONG and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4389

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ALCARAZ DEL ROSARIO MARIA

ESTATE OF CARLOS GONZALEZ

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 25

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Guardian Ad Litem and Not Classified By Court

RODRIGUEZ BLANCA

Minor

GONZALEZ CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

CASILLAS ARNOLDO ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

9/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) OF 09/14/2021

9/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) OF 09/14/2021

Order - Dismissal

9/14/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON ATTORNEY ARNOLDO CASILLAS' MOTION TO BE RELIEVED A...)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON ATTORNEY ARNOLDO CASILLAS' MOTION TO BE RELIEVED A...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON ATTORNEY ARNOLDO CASILLAS' MOTION TO BE RELIEVED A...) OF 06/03/2021

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON ATTORNEY ARNOLDO CASILLAS' MOTION TO BE RELIEVED A...) OF 06/03/2021

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/16/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/16/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF...)

4/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL) OF 02/16/2021

2/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL) OF 02/16/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/13/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

1/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FO...)

7/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FO...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...) OF 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...) OF 04/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE AND FI...)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE AND FI...)

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/16/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to File Proof of Service) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof o...) of 09/14/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to File Proof of Service) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Attorney Arnoldo Casillas' Motion to be Relieved a...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Attorney Arnoldo Casillas' Motion to be Relieved a...) of 06/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAU...) of 04/01/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Serve and File Proof of Service) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Serve and Fi...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Estate of Carlos Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Del Rosario Maria Alcaraz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694389    Hearing Date: June 3, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ESTATE OF CARLOS GONZALEZ, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC694389

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

June 3, 2021

 

Plaintiffs, Estate of Carlos Gonzalez, Carlos Gonzalez, a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Blanca Rodriguez, Maria del Rosario Alcaraz (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) attorney of record, Arnoldo Casillas (“Counsel”), has filed a motion to be relieved as counsel, contending irreconcilable differences have arisen between Plaintiffs and Counsel making continued representation impossible.  Counsel declares it served the moving papers on Plaintiffs via mail at the client’s last known address after confirming the address as current via an address verification search. 

Counsel has filed proof of service on Maria Alcaraz.  However, the court cannot locate proof of service showing all Plaintiffs were served with the moving papers.  (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(d).)  Furthermore, Counsel did not file a proposed order on mandatory judicial council forms MC-053

Based on the foregoing, the motion to be relieved is denied without prejudice.

Counsel is ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 3rd day of June, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC694389    Hearing Date: March 24, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ESTATE OF CARLOS GONZALEZ, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC694389

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

March 24, 2021

 

Plaintiffs, Estate of Carlos Gonzalez, Carlos Gonzalez, a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Blanca Rodriguez, Maria del Rosario Alcaraz (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) attorney of record, Arnoldo Casillas (“Counsel”), has filed a motion to be relieved as counsel, contending irreconcilable differences have arisen between Plaintiffs and Counsel making continued representation impossible.  Counsel declares it served the moving papers on Plaintiffs via mail at the client’s last known address after confirming the address as current via an address verification search.  Counsel has filed proof of service on Maria Alcaraz.  However, the court cannot locate proof of service showing all Plaintiffs were served with the moving papers.  (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(d).)  Furthermore, Counsel did not file a proposed order on mandatory judicial council forms MC-053

Based on the foregoing, the motion to be relieved is denied without prejudice.

Counsel is ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 24th day of March, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court