This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 08:12:00 (UTC).

ESTATE OF ALEJANDRO ALERS, SR., ET AL. VS OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 ESTATE OF ALEJANDRO ALERS, SR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6943

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF ALEJANDRO ALERS SR.

ALERS HAZEL

ALERS ALEJANDRO JR.

Defendants

LANG RONALD MD

NAGHDECHI PEJMAN MD

OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER

LOCKARD MARY JEAN MD

ROHRBACHER PHILIP RN

ZIMNY GARY RN

SEASONS HOSPICE & PALLIATIVE CARE

AHANGARZADEH ARMAN LVN

DA VITA MEDICAL GROUP

KIEFER N. ISABEL MD

SARKISSIAN HAGOP MD

WINER KELLY

KOSSUTH DO SARA MD

CARMODY THOMAS TOM

WINDSOR TERRACE HEALTHCARE CENTER SNF

HEALTH CARE PARTNERS AKA OPTUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

KATOOZI BRIAN K.

LIGORSKY BRENDA MARGO

TROPP DEBORAH S.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/21/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/21/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/21/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD PUNITIVE DAMAGES AGAINST MEDICAL PROVIDERS

7/21/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD PUNITIVE DAMAGES AGAINST MEDICAL PROVIDERS

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/21/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice of Ruling

7/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

5/18/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: REFERRING CASE TO DEPARTMENT 1, STANLEY MOSK COU...) OF 03/12/2021

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: REFERRING CASE TO DEPARTMENT 1, STANLEY MOSK COU...) OF 03/12/2021

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S OLYMPIA DEMUR TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/19/2021: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S OLYMPIA DEMUR TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))

3/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION DECLARATION OF HAZEL ALERS AS DECEDENT'S SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO COMMENCE ACTION

12/24/2020: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION DECLARATION OF HAZEL ALERS AS DECEDENT'S SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO COMMENCE ACTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAZEL ALERS AS THE DECEDENT'S SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO COMMENCE AN ACTION ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF ALEJANDRO ALERS, SR. PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTI

1/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAZEL ALERS AS THE DECEDENT'S SUCCESSOR INTEREST TO COMMENCE AN ACTION ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF ALEJANDRO ALERS, SR. PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTI

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

1/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

2/11/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Separate Statement

2/22/2021: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 430.41 AND 435.5

10/30/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 430.41 AND 435.5

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

145 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
228 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (DECLARATION OF HAZEL ALERS AS DECEDENT'S SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO COMMENCE ACTION); Filed by Estate of Alejandro Alers, Sr. (Plaintiff); HAZEL ALERS (Plaintiff); ALEJANDRO ALERS, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (DECLARATION OF HAZEL ALERS AS DECEDENT'S SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO COMMENCE ACTION); Filed by Estate of Alejandro Alers, Sr. (Plaintiff); HAZEL ALERS (Plaintiff); ALEJANDRO ALERS, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Estate of Alejandro Alers, Sr. (Plaintiff); HAZEL ALERS (Plaintiff); ALEJANDRO ALERS, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Pursuant To Code of Civil Procedure, Sections 430.41 AND 435.5); Filed by MARY JEAN LOCKARD, MD (Defendant); HAGOP SARKISSIAN, MD (Defendant); HEALTH CARE PARTNERS (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Estate of Alejandro Alers, Sr. (Plaintiff); HAZEL ALERS (Plaintiff); ALEJANDRO ALERS, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Estate of Alejandro Alers, Sr. (Plaintiff); HAZEL ALERS (Plaintiff); ALEJANDRO ALERS, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Estate of Alejandro Alers, Sr. (Plaintiff); HAZEL ALERS (Plaintiff); ALEJANDRO ALERS, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV36943    Hearing Date: March 22, 2021    Dept: 28

The Demurrer hearing will not be heard in Department 28.  The parties are not to appear on 3/22/21.The case was referred to Dept. 1, Stanley Mosk for transfer, as a non-PI case, under the definition of P.I. Cases in the general order.The case was transferred to Dept. B, Torrance Courthouse on 3/18/21.Moving parties for all are directed to call Dept. B, Torrance Courthouse to find out whether or not Dept. B will re-schedule the hearings, or require re-reserving and re-filing matters.Future hearing dates remain on the Dept. 28 docket, only by mandate of court management to make it easier for the newly assigned department to re-schedule hearings in their department, if they so choose.  No matter will be called for hearing in Department 28, Spring Street Courthosue.  

Case Number: 20STCV36943    Hearing Date: March 17, 2021    Dept: 28

The demurrer hearing will not take place in Department 28, Spring Street Courthouse. No further proceedings will take place in Department 28, Spring Street Courthouse.  Do not appear for the demurrur hearing or any further hearings in Dept. 28, Spring Street Courthouse, regardless of whether or not the matters appear on Department 28's docket.  The dates are left on the docket, in the event the newly assigned courtroom wants to use the entries to re-schedule hearings. The Court finds that this case is not a Personal Injury Case under the First Amended Standing Order Re: Personal Injury Procedures, at the Spring Street Courthouse. This case is referred to the Supervising Judge in Department 1, Stanley Mosk Courthouse for determination whether this case should be transferred and reassigned to an Independent Calendar Court.The case alleges elder abuse, discrimination, intentional misrepresentation, concealment, and patient dumping.The Supervising Judge in Department 1, Stanley Mosk Courthouse will transfer this case to an Independent Calendar Court.It will be up to the newly  assigned department whether to vacate or reschedule the hearing dates.  Counsel may contact the receiving courtroom after receiving notice of the new court assignment .

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH CARE PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SEASON HOSPICE AND PALLIATIVE CARE OF BROWARD FL is a litigant

Latest cases where OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant