This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 00:16:26 (UTC).

ESSEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. DOING BUSINESS AS ROCK HARD HARD CONCRETE VS WORLD MECHANICAL, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 ESSEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC DOING BUSINESS AS ROCK HARD HARD CONCRETE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WORLD MECHANICAL, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0778

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

ESSEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. DOING BUSINESS AS ROCK HARD HARD CONCRETE

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

WORLD MECHANICAL INC. A CORPORATION

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

ESSEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. DOING BUSINESS AS ROCK HARD HARD CONCRETE

GORDON HARRY ALLEN

THE LUZZATTO COMPANY

TERRACOTTA CREDIT REIT LLC

CIBC INC.

INSPIRE HOLLYWOOD PROPCO LLC

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BREDESON CHRISTIAN ETHAN

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

Other Attorneys

TATE THERESA

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

2/8/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

10/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR CROSS-COMPLAINANT SURET...)

10/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR CROSS-COMPLAINANT SURET...)

Case Management Order

10/5/2021: Case Management Order

Notice of Ruling

10/15/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR CROSS-COMPLAINANTS FAIL...)

9/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR CROSS-COMPLAINANTS FAIL...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

8/31/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Personal Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/25/2021: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

Case Management Statement

7/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

7/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

7/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (2ND)

7/20/2021: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (2ND)

Notice of Ruling

7/20/2021: Notice of Ruling

Summons - SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Suretec Insurance Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Essey Construction Company, Inc. doing business as Rock Hard Hard Concrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions for Cross-Complainant Suretec Insurance Co.'s failure to file proof of service) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions for Cross-Complainant World Mechanical, Inc.'s failure to file proof of service) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Cross-Complainant Suret...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Suretec Insurance Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Suretec Insurance Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Essey Construction Company, Inc. doing business as Rock Hard Hard Concrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Essey Construction Company, Inc. doing business as Rock Hard Hard Concrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Essey Construction Company, Inc. doing business as Rock Hard Hard Concrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Essey Construction Company, Inc. doing business as Rock Hard Hard Concrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Essey Construction Company, Inc. doing business as Rock Hard Hard Concrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIBC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE LUZZATTO COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ESSEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. DBA ROCK HARD CONCRETE is a litigant

Latest cases where WORLD MECHANICAL INC. is a litigant