Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2021 at 17:44:52 (UTC).

ESPINOZA, EVAN TYLER VS PENA, CATHERINE JOLIE

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 ESPINOZA, EVAN TYLER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PENA, CATHERINE JOLIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCOY, LARONDA, COPS, JENNIFER H. and GARRETT, CARLA L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0670

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MCCOY, LARONDA

COPS, JENNIFER H.

GARRETT, CARLA L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESPINOZA EVAN TYLER

Respondent

PENA CATHERINE JOLIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/19/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/20/2020: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

7/20/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

7/20/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Substitution of Attorney

7/1/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service - Mail

7/1/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

6/25/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

6/26/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

6/8/2020: FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

Minute Order

6/8/2020: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

6/8/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

6/8/2020: FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

6/8/2020: FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/20/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

5/20/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

5/20/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

5/20/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

5/20/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Garrett, Carla L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Cops, Jennifer H., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S16, McCoy, LaRonda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Advanced Previous Date & Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.