This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 03:45:05 (UTC).

ESPERANZA TAPIA VS WELLS FARGO BANK N A ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 ESPERANZA TAPIA filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK N A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7415

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

TAPIA ESPERANZA

Respondents and Defendants

NBS DEFAULT SERVICES LLC

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

HOLLYVALE RENTAL HOLDINGS LLC

MID-CAL REALTY SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHANDRA SAM ESQ.

REIN STEVEN LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

WEDGEWOOD

MCCALLA RAYMER LEIBERT PIERCE LLP

ANGLIN FLEWELLING RASMUSSEN CAMPBELL &

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/5/2018: Unknown

DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY FORECLOSURE TRUSTEE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 29241

2/5/2018: DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY FORECLOSURE TRUSTEE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 29241

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANTS MID-CAL REALTY SERVICES, INC.'S AND HOLLYVALE RENTAL HOLDINGS, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/9/2018: DEFENDANTS MID-CAL REALTY SERVICES, INC.'S AND HOLLYVALE RENTAL HOLDINGS, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

2/20/2018: DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

2/21/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/26/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Unknown

3/1/2018: Unknown

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, AND TO ANY ATTEMPT TO CONSOLIDATE OR STAY.

3/14/2018: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, AND TO ANY ATTEMPT TO CONSOLIDATE OR STAY.

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, AND TO ANY ATFEMPT TO CONSOLIDATE OR STAY.

3/14/2018: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, AND TO ANY ATFEMPT TO CONSOLIDATE OR STAY.

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, AND TO ANY ATTEMPT TO CONSOLIDATE OR STAY.

3/14/2018: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, AND TO ANY ATTEMPT TO CONSOLIDATE OR STAY.

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

3/14/2018: NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THEREON TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/29/2018: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THEREON TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/29/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/29/2018: STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Default; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 5/1/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by Esperanza Tapia (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (and Status Conference) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause regarding Dismissal and Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Esperanza Tapia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Status Conference regarding confirming receipt/ review of pro...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketJudgment (of Dismissal as to Mid-Cal Realty Services, Inc. and Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC;)

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY FORECLOSURE TRUSTEE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 29241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by NBS Default Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Esperanza Tapia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

- FILED

ESPERANZA TAPIA Superior Court of California 2107 AARON STREET , gounty of Los Angeles LOS ANGELES, CA 90026 COTE IR

| DEC3 189017

Sherr icar/Clerk PLAINTIFF IN PRO PER By. Deputy n Gomez

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES BCE87415

) CASE NO.

ESPERANZA TAPIA, COMPLAINT FOR:

. WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE

2. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA

BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTIONS 17200 ET SEQ

3. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA

HOMEOWNERS BILL OF RIGHTS

4. NEGLIGENCE

) Plaintiff, ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) 5. DECLARATORY RELIEF ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) )

WELLS FARGO BANK. N.A., NBS DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC, MID-CAL REALTY SERVICES, INC., HOLLYVALE RENTAL HOLDINGS, LLC, and DOES 1 THROUGH 35 INCLUSIVE,

6. FRAUD IN THE

CONCEALMENT

7. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION

OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

8. SLANDER OF TITLE 9. QUIET TITLE 10. INJUNCTIVE RELIEF 1. PREDATORY LENDING PRACTICES

Defendants.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NBS Default Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant