This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2021 at 04:28:18 (UTC).

ESPERANZA GONZALEZ VS BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 ESPERANZA GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6814

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ ESPERANZA

Defendant

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGREAL THOMAS

Defendant Attorney

GRAMLING KEVIN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

1/12/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Answer

1/14/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/14/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/8/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2023
  • Hearing12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Esperanza Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Esperanza Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Esperanza Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Esperanza Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Esperanza Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION is a litigant