This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 11:36:35 (UTC).

ESMERALDA GUERRERO VS THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 ESMERALDA GUERRERO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4637

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUERRERO ESMERALDA

Defendant

THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

SINGER RAINA

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER ORDER RE: STAY

10/10/2022: Order - ORDER ORDER RE: STAY

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY AND ORDER

10/10/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

7/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 07/06/2022

7/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 07/06/2022

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/6/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

6/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Notice of Related Case

6/13/2022: Notice of Related Case

Order - ORDER CASE ANYWHERE

5/13/2022: Order - ORDER CASE ANYWHERE

Case Management Order

5/16/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

5/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

5/6/2022: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Notice of Appearance

3/30/2022: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS)

3/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

2/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 02/23/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 02/23/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

2/23/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Complaint

2/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • Hearing06/16/2023 at 4:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Stay and Order; Signed and Filed by: The American Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals (Defendant); As to: Esmeralda Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketOrder Order Re: Stay; Signed and Filed by: The American Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals (Defendant); As to: Esmeralda Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;) of 07/06/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Not Related

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: The American Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer Defendant The American Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals Answer To Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint; Filed by: The American Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals (Defendant); As to: Esmeralda Guerrero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Esmeralda Guerrero (Plaintiff); As to: The American Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kenneth R. Freeman in Department 14 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Esmeralda Guerrero (Plaintiff); As to: The American Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Esmeralda Guerrero (Plaintiff); As to: The American Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less