This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2021 at 15:51:52 (UTC).

ESMERALDA GODINEZ VS THE KROGER CO.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 ESMERALDA GODINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9185

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GODINEZ ESMERALDA

Defendant

THE KROGER CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARKER MICHAEL R.

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/9/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

11/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/19/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2024
  • Hearing10/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • Hearing04/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Gregory Edward Stone (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Esmeralda Godinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Food 4 Less of California, Inc. dba Food 4 Less Erroneously Sued As The Kroger Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Esmeralda Godinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Esmeralda Godinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Esmeralda Godinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE GREGORY EDWARD