Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2020 at 05:46:16 (UTC).

ESCAGEDA, ROSALBA CAMPANA VS CORRALES, RAMIRO GARCIA

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 ESCAGEDA, ROSALBA CAMPANA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CORRALES, RAMIRO GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3831

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESCAGEDA ROSALBA CAMPANA

Respondent

CORRALES RAMIRO GARCIA

 

Court Documents

Declaration - UCCJEA

4/29/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Summons

4/29/2020: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/29/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/29/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

4/29/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/30/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

4/30/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less