This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:26:26 (UTC).

ERVAN GROVES VS ABB INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 ERVAN GROVES filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ABB INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD L. FRUIN, VALERIE SALKIN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6443

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD L. FRUIN

VALERIE SALKIN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GROVES ERVAN

GROVES JO ANN

Respondents and Defendants

ABB INC. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ITE

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION A

ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC.

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

BRAND INSULATIONS INC.

ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER CO.

BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

FLUOR DANIEL ENGINEERS & CONSTRUCTORS LTD

QUALITEX COMPANY

GOULD ELECTRONICS INC

GARDNER DENVER INC

VIKING PUMP INC

EATON CORPORATION

WARREN PUMPS LLC

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC

PARSONS GOVERNMENT SERVICES INC

49 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ASHRAFI BENNO ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

CMBG3 LAW LLC

MANION GAYNOR & MANNING LLP

PALMIERI TYLER WIENER WILEHLM WALDRON

SINUNU BRUNI LLP

BARNES MICHELE C.

BASSI MARTE J. ESQ

BECHERER KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

DEJARDIN BRADFORD J.

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

GORDON & REES LLP

HUGO PARKER LLP

K&L GATES LLP

KEVIN JAMISON LAW PC

LOW BALL & LYNCH

MANNING GROSS + MASSENBURG LLP

MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

TUCKER ELLIS LLP

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN

Other Attorneys

BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL LLP

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/11/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/13/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/15/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/27/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Jury Question

4/12/2019: Jury Question

Jury Instructions

4/12/2019: Jury Instructions

Jury Instructions

4/12/2019: Jury Instructions

Jury Instructions

4/12/2019: Jury Instructions

Jury Question

4/12/2019: Jury Question

Jury Question

4/12/2019: Jury Question

Jury Question

4/15/2019: Jury Question

Notice

4/15/2019: Notice

Special Verdict

4/15/2019: Special Verdict

Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

4/15/2019: Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

Opposition

5/6/2019: Opposition

Opposition

5/6/2019: Opposition

Substitution of Attorney

5/13/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice

5/16/2019: Notice

782 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Judgment (in Favor of Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.); Filed by Viking Pump, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department C, Valerie Salkin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Notice (of Removal of Defendant D.W. Nicholson Corporation's Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict Regarding Future Medical Damages); Filed by D.W. Nicholson Corporation (Doe 2) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Sonja Elizabeth Blomquist (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Opposition (to defendant D.W. Nicholson Corp. motion for Judgment notwithstanding the verdict); Filed by Ervan Groves (Plaintiff); Jo Ann Groves (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Opposition (to Defendant D.W. Nicholson Corporation's Motion For Judgment notwithstanding the verdict regarding future medical damages; Declaration of Josiah Parker in support of thereof); Filed by Ervan Groves (Plaintiff); Jo Ann Groves (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • at 09:22 AM in Department C, Valerie Salkin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Judgment (- Judgment on the Verdict - After Jury Trial - entered for Plaintiff Groves, Ervan AN INDIVIDUAL; Plaintiff Groves, Jo Ann AN INDIVIDUAL against Defendant D.W. NICHOLSON CORPORATION.); Filed by Ervan Groves (Plaintiff); Jo Ann Groves (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Viking Pump, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
871 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • PIAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Ervan Groves (Plaintiff); Jo Ann Groves (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLUOR DANIEL ENGINEERS & CONSTRUCTORS LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBAY CONSTRUCTION CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where QUALITEX COMPANY is a litigant