This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 03:31:41 (UTC).

ERNESTO ROSALES DURAN, ET AL. VS HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 ERNESTO ROSALES DURAN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2005

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DURAN ERNESTO ROSALES

ROSALES DURAN MANUEL ISMAEL

Defendants

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

HENRY COMPANY LLC

JOHN K. BICE CO. INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

DAP PRODUCTS INC. DOE 1

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC. DOE 2

PFIZER INC. DOE 3

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION DOE 6

VANDERBILT MINERALS LLC FKA VANDERBILT CO. DOE 4

SOCO WEST INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST INC. FKA SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION AKA SOCO-WESTERN CHEMICAL CO. AKA STINNES OIL & CHEMICAL COMPANY

SOCO WEST INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST INC. FKA SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION AKA SOCO-WESTERN CHEMICAL CO. AKA STINNES OIL & CHEMICAL COMPANY SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO WESTERN CHEMICAL & MANUFACTURING COMPANY

VANDERBILT MINERALS LLC FKA VANDERBILT CO. INC. SIII TO INTERNATIONAL TALC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOEW KEVIN M.

Defendant Attorneys

HUIE JEREMY D.

MONROE MONICA WILLIAMS

SCHIRM BARRY R.

CATALONA ALEXANDER PAUL

DUFFY JOSEPH

GARRATT JUSTIN E.

NICHOLS STEPHEN M.

AMEELE MELANIE L.

 

Court Documents

Answer

9/7/2021: Answer

Answer

8/25/2021: Answer

Answer

8/26/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

8/20/2021: Answer

Answer

7/22/2021: Answer

Answer

7/23/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - HENRY COMPANY LLC'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/2/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - HENRY COMPANY LLC'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/19/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/19/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/19/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • Hearing01/05/2022 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Status Conference ((Waters, Kraus & Paul)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pfizer, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DAP Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketHenry Company LLC's Demand For Jury Trial; Filed by Henry Company LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Henry Company LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Ernesto Rosales Duran (Plaintiff); Manuel Ismael Rosales Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Ernesto Rosales Duran (Plaintiff); Manuel Ismael Rosales Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Ernesto Rosales Duran (Plaintiff); Manuel Ismael Rosales Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ernesto Rosales Duran (Plaintiff); Manuel Ismael Rosales Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ernesto Rosales Duran (Plaintiff); Manuel Ismael Rosales Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ernesto Rosales Duran (Plaintiff); Manuel Ismael Rosales Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Manuel Ismael Rosales Duran); Filed by Ernesto Rosales Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENRY COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHN K. BICE CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOCO WEST INC. is a litigant