This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 07:50:06 (UTC).

ERNESTO P. MARTINEZ, JR. VS PLANET HOME LENDING, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 ERNESTO P MARTINEZ, JR filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PLANET HOME LENDING, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4393

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ ERNESTO P. JR.

Defendants

PRESTIGE DEFAULT SERVICES INC.

PLANET HOME LENDING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THEODOSIADIS THEODORE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION AN ORDER PRELIMINARILY AND PERMANENTLY ENJOINING DEFENDANTS FROM CONDUCTING FORECLOSURE SALE

2/18/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION AN ORDER PRELIMINARILY AND PERMANENTLY ENJOINING DEFENDANTS FROM CONDUCTING FORECLOSURE SALE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - EX PARTE APPLICATION TAKEN OFF CALENDAR)

2/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - EX PARTE APPLICATION TAKEN OFF CALENDAR)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF THEODORE THEODOSIADIS

2/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF THEODORE THEODOSIADIS

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

2/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/4/2021: Complaint

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTION

2/4/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (An Order Preliminarily And Permanently Enjoining Defendants From Conducting Foreclosure Sale) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order - Ex Parte Application Taken Off Calendar)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Theodore Theodosiadis); Filed by Ernesto P. Martinez, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (An Order Preliminarily And Permanently Enjoining Defendants From Conducting Foreclosure Sale); Filed by Ernesto P. Martinez, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For Injunction) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ernesto P. Martinez, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ernesto P. Martinez, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For Injunction); Filed by Ernesto P. Martinez, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ernesto P. Martinez, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (In Support of Ex Parte Application); Filed by Ernesto P. Martinez, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESTIGE DEFAULT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Planet Home Lending is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THEODOSIADIS THEODORE