This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2022 at 16:48:45 (UTC).

ERNESTO OJEDA VS VAN NUYS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 ERNESTO OJEDA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VAN NUYS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0468

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OJEDA ERNESTO

Defendant

VAN NUYS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSEY SHARON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/1/2022: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS ELECTION TO RECEIVE SERVICE EXCLUSIVELY BY ELECTRONIC MEANS

4/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFFS ELECTION TO RECEIVE SERVICE EXCLUSIVELY BY ELECTRONIC MEANS

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/12/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

7/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ernesto Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ernesto Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ernesto Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ernesto Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Plaintiffs Election to Receive Service Exclusively By Electronic Means); Filed by Ernesto Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ernesto Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ernesto Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VAN NUYS FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASSEY SHARON