This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 11:38:12 (UTC).

ERNESTO MORENO VS JINON CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 ERNESTO MORENO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against JINON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5649

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO ERNESTO

Defendant

JINON CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMITH EVAN JASON

SMITH EVAN JASON ESQUIRE

Defendant Attorneys

DELGADO WILLIAM A.

UTSUMI DAWN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS ACTION

10/22/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS ACTION

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/12/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE

11/12/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

10/22/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DISMISSAL [CRC 3.770])

10/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DISMISSAL [CRC 3.770])

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

7/8/2020: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Notice of Appearance

7/2/2020: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFE...)

7/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFE...)]

7/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFE...)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE;)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE;) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE;) OF 04/14/2020

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Initial Status Conference Order

3/2/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

3/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 03/02/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 03/02/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/13/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Address Change; Filed by Jinon Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by William A. Delgado (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docketat 3:45 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Dismiss Action); Filed by Ernesto Moreno (Plaintiff); Jinon Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Dismissal [CRC 3.770])); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Frank Ferreiro in Support of Dismissal); Filed by Ernesto Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Evan J. Smith in Support of Dismissal); Filed by Ernesto Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ernesto Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:05 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;) of 03/02/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ernesto Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ernesto Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JINON CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ENTITY DBA NIJIYA MARKET is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELGADO WILLIAM ALEXANDER