This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 04:32:36 (UTC).

ERNEST JOSEPH FRANCESCHI, JR. VS 11343 PENROSE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 ERNEST JOSEPH FRANCESCHI, JR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 11343 PENROSE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2467

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANCESCHI ERNEST JOSEPH JR.

FRANCESCHI ERNEST J. JR.

Defendants

11343 PENROSE INC.

CHAVIRA CINDY

11343 PENROSE INC. LA VIDA GENTLEMEN'S CLUB

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

6/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/17/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSA...)

10/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSA...) OF 10/20/2021

10/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSA...) OF 10/20/2021

Order - Dismissal

10/20/2021: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/07/2021

10/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for failure to proceed with entry of defaults as to 1) 11343 Penrose, Inc.; and 2) Cindy Chavira) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for failure to prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissa...) of 10/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissa...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 10/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 11343 PENROSE INC. dba LA VIDA GENTLEMENS CLUB is a litigant