This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2023 at 02:09:27 (UTC).

ERNEST HAROYAN VS IKEA HOLDING US, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 ERNEST HAROYAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against IKEA HOLDING US, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KERRY BENSINGER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3955

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KERRY BENSINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAROYAN ERNEST

Defendant

IKEA HOLDING US INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAKIM SHARONA ESLAMBOLY ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/28/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/17/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

5/18/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Settlement

6/14/2023: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

7/14/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Ernest Haroyan (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 07/17/2023 ; As To Parties changed from IKEA US West, Inc. Erroneously Sued As IKEA Holding US, Inc. (Defendant) to IKEA US West, Inc. Erroneously Sued As IKEA Holding US, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - conditional scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ernest Haroyan on 04/12/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Ernest Haroyan as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Ernest Haroyan (Plaintiff); As to: IKEA US West, Inc. Erroneously Sued As IKEA Holding US, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ernest Haroyan (Plaintiff); As to: IKEA Holding US, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ernest Haroyan (Plaintiff); As to: IKEA Holding US, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ernest Haroyan (Plaintiff); As to: IKEA Holding US, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less