This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 03:49:28 (UTC).

ERNEST ARMSTRONG VS OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 ERNEST ARMSTRONG filed an Other lawsuit against OSAGE HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD FRUIN and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3507

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD FRUIN

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Minor and Plaintiff

ARMSTRONG ERNEST

Defendants and Respondents

OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE

DOES 1 TO 250

CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING AND WELLNESS

OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING AND WELLNESS CENTRE EAST

Guardian Ad Litem

ARMSTRONG ERNESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorneys

GHARIBIAN LAW APC

MORAN LAW

MORAN MICHAEL F.

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

Unknown

3/6/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

2/8/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE, EAST, LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/9/2018: DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE, EAST, LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE, EAST LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAIRT

2/9/2018: DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE, EAST LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAIRT

DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC DBA OASAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORT

2/28/2018: DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC DBA OASAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORT

Minute Order

2/28/2018: Minute Order

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SETS THREE (3), FOUR(4) AND FIVE (5) FROM DEFENDANT OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS

2/28/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SETS THREE (3), FOUR(4) AND FIVE (5) FROM DEFENDANT OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SETS THREE, FOUR AND FIVE, FROM DEFENDANT; ETC.

2/28/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SETS THREE, FOUR AND FIVE, FROM DEFENDANT; ETC.

ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRI

2/28/2018: ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRI

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING HEARING ON DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE

2/28/2018: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING HEARING ON DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/10/2018: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/10/2018: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/16/2018: DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/16/2018: DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC DBA OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER RE: A. DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE, EAST, LLC'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND; ETC.

4/23/2018: ORDER RE: A. DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE, EAST, LLC'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND; ETC.

Minute Order

4/23/2018: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

4/23/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

NOTICE OF RULING

4/24/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference (DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ernest Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE, CONDITIONAL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Ex Parte Motion - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; MOTION - COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES - Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketReply/Response; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • Docketin Department 15, Richard Fruin, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketAffidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (170.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketAffidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (170.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR ERNEST ARMSTRONG ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ernest Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR ERNEST ARMSTRONG GUARDIAN AD LITEM(FAXED) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ernest Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

GEORGE E. NOWOTNY, SB# 150481 FELED E-Mail: George.Nowotny@lewisbrisbois.com Sup~-~ Coun of Cal'ceTia LYNNETTE A. CHRISTOPOULOS, SB# 192123 Coui'tv nf 1 os Anneles E-Mail: Lynnette.Christopoulos@lewisbrisbois.com . s AJAY P. SAHNI, SB#297679 . GEC 11 20%7 63];-\1;/42511:5%] g{lfesgtl:nslgleemg%rmbms.com _ Sherri | Carter, Exgguitve Oflicc;Cletrf. Los Angeles, California 90071 By L Sanche:_-:t— epuly

Telephone: 213.250.1800 Facsimile: 213.250.7900

Attorneys for Defendant, CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE, EAST, LLC dba OSAGE HEALTHCARE &

WELLNESS CENTRE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

ERNEST ARMSTRONG, by and through his CASE NO. BC653507 Guardian ad Litem, Ernessa Armstrong, [Assigned for All Purposes to: Plaintiff, The Hon. Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet, Dept. 50]

- DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED OSAGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE

CENTRE dba CENTINELA SKILLED EAST, LLC dba OSAGE HEALTHCARE NURSING and WELLNESS CENTRE EAST; | & WELLNESS CENTRE’S REPLY IN and DOES 1 through 250, inclusive, SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO

PLAINTIFEF’S FIRST AMENDED

Defendants. . COMPLAINT

DATE: December 18, 2017 TIME: 8:30 a.m.

DEPT.: 50

Action Filed: March 6, 2017 FSC Date: March 2, 2018 Trial Date: March 14, 2018

TO ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD: Defendant CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST, LLC /]

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE EAST LLC. is a litigant