Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 02:21:10 (UTC).

ERIN HUGHES VS CAY LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 ERIN HUGHES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5866

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUGHES ERIN

Defendants

GRIGORIAN GRANT A

YOON JEANNIE

SAHARA MANAGEMENT LLC

CAY LLC

MICHAELIAN ZINAIDA ALIAS ZINAIDA MIKAELYAN ALIAS ZINA MIKAYELYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRUZMAN ALEKSANDR

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

5/19/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 05/19/2021

5/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 05/19/2021

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - No Service - PROOF OF SERVICE - NO SERVICE DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

5/3/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - PROOF OF SERVICE - NO SERVICE DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/6/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/19/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 05/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service (Declaration of Diligence); Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erin Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less