Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 19:32:44 (UTC).

ERIKA SAWHNEY VS CITIZEN SOUTH BAY ON W235TH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 ERIKA SAWHNEY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITIZEN SOUTH BAY ON W235TH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0275

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAWHNEY ERIKA

Defendants

COASTLINE REAL ESTATE ADVISORS

CLPF VISTA NORTH LP

CITIZEN SOUTH BAY ON W235TH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOHN STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

4/12/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • Hearing08/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Hearing08/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Erika Sawhney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Erika Sawhney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erika Sawhney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTLINE REAL ESTATE ADVISORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEVEN E WOHN