This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 06:32:53 (UTC).

ERIKA C. MARTINEZ VS FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 ERIKA C MARTINEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0169

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ ERIKA C.

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANVAR JESSICA

ANVAR JESSICA FARRAH

Defendant Attorneys

ROUBINIAN LEON V.

ROUBINIAN LEON VRAM

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/6/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

3/12/2020: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

3/17/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Personal Service

2/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • Hearing07/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Hearing07/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Erika C. Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Erika C. Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erika C. Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Erika C. Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.