This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2023 at 04:46:19 (UTC).

ERIKA BENE SIMON VS THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 ERIKA BENE SIMON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUTH ANN KWAN and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1942

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUTH ANN KWAN

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

SIMON ERIKA BENE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VUONG SNOW TUYET

HINDIN ROBERT M.

HUSHING-KLINE BRIGHTON

Defendant Attorneys

KATOUZIAN ROSHANNE CLARA

BAKER MATTHEW F.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS RE ALEUTIAN DRIVE (RECORDED)

11/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS RE ALEUTIAN DRIVE (RECORDED)

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS RE WILKINSON AVE; RECORDED

11/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS RE WILKINSON AVE; RECORDED

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION RE 5837 WILKINSON AVE, VALLEY VILLAGE, CA

9/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION RE 5837 WILKINSON AVE, VALLEY VILLAGE, CA

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION RE 2721 EVEREST WAY, PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB, CA

9/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION RE 2721 EVEREST WAY, PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB, CA

Request for Dismissal

9/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION RE 16609 ALEUTIAN DRIVE, PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB, CA

9/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION RE 16609 ALEUTIAN DRIVE, PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB, CA

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROSHANNE C. KATOUZIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL

6/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROSHANNE C. KATOUZIAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL

Motion to Bifurcate

6/9/2022: Motion to Bifurcate

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT HINDIN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL

6/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT HINDIN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY BARAK RAVIV, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV FOR SEPARATE TRIAL

6/20/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY BARAK RAVIV, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV FOR SEPARATE TRIAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROSHANNE C. KATOUZIAN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL

6/28/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROSHANNE C. KATOUZIAN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL

6/28/2022: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE)

7/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE)

Notice of Ruling

7/13/2022: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

7/14/2022: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 07/15/2022

7/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 07/15/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

7/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

7/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens re Aleutian Drive (Recorded); Filed by: Erika Bene Simon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens re Wilkinson Ave; RECORDED; Filed by: Erika Bene Simon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Erika Bene Simon on 10/30/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Erika Bene Simon as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action re 2721 Everest Way, Pine Mountain Club, CA; Filed by: Erika Bene Simon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action re 5837 Wilkinson Ave, Valley Village, CA; Filed by: Erika Bene Simon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action re 16609 Aleutian Drive, Pine Mountain Club, CA; Filed by: Erika Bene Simon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Erika Bene Simon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Matthew F. Baker (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/06/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Erika Bene Simon (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Hon. Ruth A. Kwan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 55 - Hon. Malcolm Mackey; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Robert M. Hindin (Attorney): Organization Name: Robert Hindin & Associates, APLC; Middle Name changed from Marc to M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAddress for Robert M. Hindin (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ruth Ann Kwan in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Erika Bene Simon (Plaintiff); As to: The Estate of Ron Raviv (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Erika Bene Simon (Plaintiff); As to: The Estate of Ron Raviv (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Erika Bene Simon (Plaintiff); As to: The Estate of Ron Raviv (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1942 Hearing Date: July 6, 2022 Dept: 55

SIMON v. THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV *******1942

Hearing Date: 7/6/22, Dept. 55

#8: MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL.

Notice: Okay

Opposition

MP: Barak Raviv, Administrator of Defendant THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV

RP: Plaintiff

Summary

On 10/30/20, Plaintiff ERIKA BENE SIMON filed a Complaint alleging that Defendant THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV breached the decedent’s prior oral agreement to treat Plaintiff as his wife, when it failed to distribute Raviv’s trust properties as agreed and pursuant to testamentary intent as expressed in the RRES Estate Plan.

The causes of action are:

1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT

2. DECLARATORY RELIEF

3. CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST.

On 4/23/21, Defendant filed a Cross-Complaint against Plaintiff, for an Order Compelling the Return of Estate Property, Financial Elder Abuse, Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Conversion, and Surcharging, including because Plaintiff utilized an expired power of attorney to wrongfully withdraw over $600,000 from Decedent’s Union Bank accounts just one day before Decedent’s passing

MP Positions

Moving party requests an order that the Cross-Complaint be separately tried before the Complaint, on bases including the following:

The equitable causes of action in the Cross-Complaint—Order Compelling the Return of Estate Property and Surcharging—should be tried first, because if Plaintiff is found to have acted in bad faith in failing to return Estate property, she will be deemed to have pre-deceased Decedent. Cal. Prob. Code 259.

If the relief under Cal. Prob. Code 259, sought in the Cross-Complaint— that Plaintiff be deemed to have pre-deceased Decedent— gets granted at trial, then the Complaint would be disposed of in avoidance of a lengthy trial on the Complaint.

RP Positions

Opposing party advocates denying, for reasons including the following:

Every fact and legal concept at issue in the Complaint is at issue in the exact same way in the Cross-Complaint, such that the issues are intimately entwined.

Whether Simon’s actions are sanctionable in regard to Probate 259, is based on whether she had a good objective or subjective reason for believing she was authorized by Oral Agreement regarding the distribution of Ron’s assets or other direction from Ron to withdraw the money.

Without any discovery on the banking or medical institutions, Defendant cannot say anything with any confidence regarding Simon’s, or Defendant’s, liability or authorization regarding any account.

Defendant’s fact pattern for Plaintiffs bad faith, and Plaintiffs fact pattern for her right to estate property, are not so much overlapping fact patterns.

Tentative Ruling

The motion is granted.

Trial is bifurcated to first hear the issues of Probate Code Section 259. Cf. Est. of Lowrie (2004) 118 Cal. App. 4th 220, 225 (“A bifurcated trial was held before the court. At the end of the first phase of the trial, the court found, by clear and convincing evidence, that Sheldon was guilty of elder abuse by reason of neglect, isolation, and financial abuse. In that Sheldon was found to be liable for elder abuse, the trial court found that Sheldon was disinherited from decedent's estate (Prob.Code, 259).”)



Case Number: *******1942    Hearing Date: June 3, 2021    Dept: 55

SIMON v. THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV *******1942

Hearing Date: 6/3/21, Dept. 55

#10: MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIM.

Notice: Okay

Non-opposition

MP: Barak Raviv, Administrator of Defendant THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV

RP: Plaintiff

Summary

On 10/30/20, Plaintiff ERIKA BENE SIMON filed a Complaint alleging that Defendant THE ESTATE OF RON RAVIV breached the decedent’s prior oral agreement to treat Plaintiff as his wife, when it failed to distribute Raviv’s trust properties as agreed and pursuant to testamentary intent as expressed in the RRES Estate Plan.

The causes of action are:

1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT

2. DECLARATORY RELIEF

3. CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST.

MP Positions

Moving party requests an order striking punitive damages allegations from the Complaint, on bases including the following:

· The request for punitive damages contains nothing more than boilerplate language from Cal. Civ. Code ; 3294, in an attempt to meet the required allegations of oppression, fraud or malice.

· Without any facts to support Plaintiff’s claim for punitive damages, the claim should be stricken.

·

Tentative Ruling

The non-opposed motion is granted, without leave to amend, as prayed.

Twenty days to answer the surviving allegations.

Not opposing a motion creates a waiver of the issues raised therein. Bell v. Am. Title Ins. Co. (1991) 226 Cal. App. 3d 1589, 1602; Cabrini Villas Homeowners Assn. v. Haghverdian (2003) 111 Cal. App. 4th 683, 693.