This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 03:05:36 (UTC).

ERIKA BAUTISTA VS ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 ERIKA BAUTISTA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1282

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAUTISTA ERIKA

Defendants

SOLIS ALFREDO

ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

O'BRIEN SEAN AUGUST

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/24/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

3/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Ruling

7/29/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION SO PARTIES ...) OF 08/20/2021

8/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION SO PARTIES ...) OF 08/20/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION SO PARTIES ...)

8/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION SO PARTIES ...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION SO PARTIES CAN PROCEED TO ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO PRE-EXISTING CONTRACTUAL AGREEMENT TO ARBITRATE; [PROPOSED ORDER]

8/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION SO PARTIES CAN PROCEED TO ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO PRE-EXISTING CONTRACTUAL AGREEMENT TO ARBITRATE; [PROPOSED ORDER]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Request for Default) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as Alfredo Solis) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Stay Action so Parties ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Stay Action so Parties ...) of 08/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Stay Action So Parties Can Proceed to Arbitration Pursuant to Pre-Existing Contractual Agreement to Arbitrate; [Proposed Order]); Filed by ABM Industry Groups, LLC (Defendant); Alfredo Solis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Erika Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Erika Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Erika Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erika Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erika Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Erika Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant