This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2023 at 15:29:51 (UTC).

ERIK SMALLS VS WEENA LEZETTE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 ERIK SMALLS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WEENA LEZETTE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2121

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMALLS ERIK

Defendants

AIRBNB INC.

AIRBNB PAYMENTS INC.

LAFAYETTE HOTEL

LEZETTE WEENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/30/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/30/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/30/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2024
  • Hearing09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2024
  • Hearing03/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ERIK SMALLS (Plaintiff); As to: WEENA LEZETTE (Defendant); AIRBNB, INC. (Defendant); AIRBNB PAYMENTS, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ERIK SMALLS (Plaintiff); As to: WEENA LEZETTE (Defendant); AIRBNB, INC. (Defendant); AIRBNB PAYMENTS, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ERIK SMALLS (Plaintiff); As to: WEENA LEZETTE (Defendant); AIRBNB, INC. (Defendant); AIRBNB PAYMENTS, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less