This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 15:29:15 (UTC).

ERIK SALVADOR GUZMAN VS CARL ORLANDO BENITEZ PEREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 ERIK SALVADOR GUZMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARL ORLANDO BENITEZ PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1938

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUZMAN ERIK SALVADOR

Defendants

BENITEZ PEREZ CARL ORLANDO

RODRIGUEZ EDGAR

RODRIGUEZ JULIA LORENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAVIDOW ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/8/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/8/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/8/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/8/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/8/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2025
  • Hearing04/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • Hearing10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Erik Salvador Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erik Salvador Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Erik Salvador Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAVIDOW, ROBERT M