This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2020 at 02:54:40 (UTC).

ERIK L LASSMAN VS DORENE ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 03/14/2018 ERIK L LASSMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DORENE ROBINSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8369

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

LASSMAN ERIK L.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ROBINSON DORENE

ROAD RUNNER LAND & HOMES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEYS IVY CREST

IVY CREST ATTORNEYS

ORONSAYE CHRISTIAN

ORONSAYE CHRISTIAN IGHEGHA

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

7/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/11/2020: Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

9/18/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR ...)

9/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-08-10 00:00:00

8/10/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-08-10 00:00:00

Answer

1/18/2019: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Notice of Case Management Conference

3/14/2018: Notice - Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/14/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/19/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Mail -

7/20/2018: Proof of Service by Mail -

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING ...) of 10/19/2018

10/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING ...) of 10/19/2018

Response - Response TO PLAINTIFF'S ERIKS DECLARATION

10/24/2018: Response - Response TO PLAINTIFF'S ERIKS DECLARATION

Minute Order - Minute Order (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING ...)

10/19/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING ...)

Case Management Statement -

7/31/2018: Case Management Statement -

Answer -

7/15/2018: Answer -

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -

7/16/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • Hearing11/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (And File First Amended Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions/Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketRequest (TO ADMIT OPPOSITION TO ERIK L. LASMAN MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by DORENE ROBINSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketOpposition (TO ERIK L. LASMAN MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE (PROPOSED) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by DORENE ROBINSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE FIRST AMENDED C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Non-Opposition); Filed by ERIK L. LASSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by ERIK L. LASSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by ERIK L. LASSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ERIK L. LASSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ERIK L. LASSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: PC058369    Hearing Date: July 27, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 7/27/20

Case #PC058369

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Motion filed on 3/11/20.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Erik L. Lassman

RESPONDING PARTY: Defendants Dorene Robinson and Road Runner Land & Homes, LLC

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order granting leave to file a First Amended Complaint which dismisses Erik L. Lassman as Plaintiff without prejudice; dismisses all causes of action in the original complaint without prejudice; adds new Plaintiff Dewelt, LLC and adds three new causes of action for (1) Quiet Title; (2) Reformation of Deed; and (3) Declaratory Relief.

RULING: The unopposed motion is granted. Plaintiff must separately file the First Amended Complaint and cannot rely on the copy attached as Exhibit A to motion. Plaintiff must also properly serve the First Amended Complaint on the registered agent for the active Road Runner Land & Homes, LLC.

Due to the liberal policy of allowing leave to amend and lack of undue prejudice to Defendants, the motion is granted. However, Plaintiff must properly serve the First Amended Complaint on the registered agent for the active Road Runner Land & Homes, LLC. Plaintiff has no evidence to support its conclusion/allegation that the name Road Runner Land & Homes, LLC has been acquired by a third party who has no family or business relationship to the Defendant Road Runner Land & Homes, LLC and Defendant Dorene Robinson. (See Proposed FAC ¶15; Oronsaye Decl. ¶¶5-12).