This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 16:16:18 (UTC).

ERIK HOWELL VS LG CHEM LTD ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 ERIK HOWELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against LG CHEM LTD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4701

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BENTLEY GREGORY L.

HOWELL ERIK

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

LG CHEM LTD

DOES 1 TO 100

CRYSTAL VAPORS

E VAPE MODS

E-VAPE MODS

DMKM GROUP INC.

MODS E-VAPE

VAPORS CRYSTAL

LA VAPOR INC

LA VAPORS INC.

LA VAPOR INC. DOE 1

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff

DMKM GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BENTLEY GREGORY L.

BENTLEY & MORE LLP

BENTLEY GREGORY LAWRENCE

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL MAGUIRE & ASSOCIATES

TSO KAREN K.

CHAN SALLY S

INGOLD TREVOR JASON

GALLIVER JAMES

GALLIVER JAMES REID

SALDANA KATHRYN ANN

BARKER DAVID E.

BARKER DAVID EDWIN

ASTOURIAN PARO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

TSO KAREN K.

CHAN SALLY S

PARASCANDOLA ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/24/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

9/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/11/2020

5/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/11/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF VACATED TRIAL & HEARING DATES, NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

5/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF VACATED TRIAL & HEARING DATES, NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Substitution of Attorney

4/10/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

9/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF AS TO DEFENDANT LG CHEM, LTD ONLY

8/13/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF AS TO DEFENDANT LG CHEM, LTD ONLY

Order - ORDER COURT'S ORDER RE: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUC

6/21/2019: Order - ORDER COURT'S ORDER RE: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUC

Case Management Statement

7/2/2019: Case Management Statement

Status Report - STATUS REPORT REGARDING MOTION TO QUASH AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

6/19/2019: Status Report - STATUS REPORT REGARDING MOTION TO QUASH AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

4/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

Notice of Ruling

3/21/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice - Notice NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION JUDGE AND NOTICE OF HEARING IN THE LOST ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

2/25/2019: Notice - Notice NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION JUDGE AND NOTICE OF HEARING IN THE LOST ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

2/21/2019: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/3/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • Hearing05/04/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Hearing03/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DMKM Group Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (Amended Notice of Ruling at Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Erik Howell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by DMKM Group Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial ((time estimate for trial is 5-7 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Erik Howell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gregory L. Bentley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gregory L. Bentley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. STRICT PRODUCTS LIABILITY 2. NEGLIGENT PRODUCTS LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Erik Howell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gregory L. Bentley (Plaintiff); Erik Howell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694701    Hearing Date: November 05, 2019    Dept: SEC

HOWELL v. LG CHEM Ltd., et al.

CASE NO.: BC694701

HEARING:  11/5/19

JUDGE: RAUL A. SAHAGUN

#4

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendant LG Chem, Ltd.’s motion to quash service of summons and complaint is taken OFF-CALENDAR pursuant to movant’s Notice of Withdrawal filed on 8/30/19.